Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Progressive West Insurance Company, filed a(n) Civil - Limited case represented by Nivinskus, Mark R, against Young, Derrick W, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTari L. Cody Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions111 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time534 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
April 28, 2014 | Tentative Ruling |
No notice of intent to appear is required. If you wish to submit on the tentative decision, you may send a telefax to Judge Cody's secretary at 805-662-6712, stating that you submit on the tentative. ...
Judge: Tari Cody |
|
April 28, 2014 |
Judge: Tari L. Cody |
||
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Order for Payment of Judgment in Installments filed by Young, Derrick W on 04/28/2014. | |
April 28, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Motion To Pay Judgment By Installments (CLM) heard 04/28/2014 08:20:00 AM. | |
April 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
April 02, 2014 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) filed by Young, Derrick W on 03/25/2014. | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Young, Derrick W Application for Waiver granted in full. | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion to Pay Judgment in Installments filed by Young, Derrick W on 03/25/2014. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.