Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Beltran, Magdalena filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2013 |
CategoryLetters Of Administration |
Last RefreshedAugust 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 26, 2023 | Due 01/13/23 | ||
July 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing (for 01/26/2023) filed by Beltran, Magdalena on 07/28/2022. | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Final Account and Report, Fees and Final Distribution heard 07/21/2022 09:00:00 AM. | |
July 21, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Report - Due 01/13/23 scheduled for 01/26/2023 at 09:00:00 AM in J6 at Oxnard. | |
July 21, 2022 | |||
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - MAILING filed by Beltran, Magdalena on 07/20/2022. | |
July 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Status Report (Report Re Status of Administration) filed by Beltran, Magdalena on 07/20/2022. | |
July 18, 2022 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
March 23, 2022 | RE: Removing Magdalena Beltran as Administrator | ||
March 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Court's Order to Show Cause re Failure to File Status Report (PR) heard 03/23/2022 09:00:00 AM. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.