Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Bloom, Maria, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Flahavan, William F, against Repipe 1, represented by Tepper, Nicholas, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kent M. Kellegrew presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKent M. Kellegrew Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2013 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial237 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions533 days |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time567 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Bloom, Maria on 05/21/2015. | |
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Other court dismissal - Conditional or Good Faith. | |
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Other court dismissal - Conditional or Good Faith. | |
April 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (for settlement CCP 664.6) filed by Repipe 1 on 04/17/2015. | |
April 13, 2015 | (time estimate 5 days) | ||
March 25, 2015 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Notice of Conditional Settlement (June 1 2015) filed by Bloom, Maria on 03/20/2015. | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference - scheduled for 03/25/2015 at 09:00:00 AM in 22 was vacated. | |
March 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (LC) - (time estimate 5 days) scheduled for 04/13/2015 at 01:30:00 PM in 43 was vacated. | |
March 11, 2015 | Docket Event | Mandatory Settlement Conference Statement received from Bloom, Maria on 03/11/2015 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.