Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Malibu Equity Investments Llc, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Schneberg, William G., against Munoz, Juan, Gonzales, Esmeralda, represented by Nielsen, Jonathan L, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2013 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions8 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time1865 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 27 effective 12/09/2018. | |
February 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
February 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession Returned (Without Satisfaction) filed by Malibu Equity Investments LLC on 02/04/2014. | |
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 48 effective 02/02/2014. | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment - Stipulated filed by Malibu Equity Investments LLC on 12/11/2013. | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Application for Writ of Possession filed by Malibu Equity Investments LLC on 12/11/2013. | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Stipulated judgment. | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 12/11/2013. | |
December 11, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment for Malibu Equity Investments LLC against Gonzales, Esmeralda ;Munoz, Juan in the amount of: 2041.82 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 525.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 450.00 attorney fees entered on 12/11/2013. See judgment for other details |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.