Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Seabright Insurance Company, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Ferber, Brian J., against Scott, Kathryn A, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 31, 2013 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Other |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions61 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time1403 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
April 02, 2014 |
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
||
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/02/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Seabright Insurance Company on 12/31/2013. | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Seabright Insurance Company on 10/31/2013. | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 04/02/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Seabright Insurance Company on 10/31/2013. Filed By: Seabright Insurance Company(Plaintiff) Refers To: Scott, Kathryn(Defendant) | |
October 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 41. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.