Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hayes, Angela filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 30, 2013 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2014 | Receipt of the Confidential Guardianship Status Report | ||
December 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Confidential Guardianship Status Report filed by Hayes, Angela on 12/05/2014. | |
April 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Hayes, Angela Application for Waiver granted in part on 04/18/2014 . | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Application/Request to Waive Additional Court Fees and Costs (aas to Court Investigator Fees) filed by Hayes, Angela on 04/17/2014. | |
December 31, 2013 | |||
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | The Court appoints Angela Hayes as guardian. Letters to issue. | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Letters of Guardianship filed by Hayes, Angela on 12/31/2013. | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Order Appointing Guardian of Minor filed by Hayes, Angela on 12/31/2013. | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Letter issued on 12/31/2013. | |
December 31, 2013 | Docket Event | Status Review (Guardianship) - Receipt of the Confidential Guardianship Status Report scheduled for 12/31/2014 at 08:35:00 AM in J1 at Oxnard. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.