Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Desert Schools Federal Credit Union A Federally Chartered Credit Union, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Goodman, Howard, against Collis, James A, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 30, 2013 |
CategoryEnforcement |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Cycle Time127 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2014 | Docket Event | Abstract issued on 03/06/2014. | |
November 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - PERSONAL (Notice of entry of judgment on sister state, application for entry of judgment on sister state) filed by Desert Schools Federal Credit Union a federally chartered credit union on 11/15/2013. | |
November 07, 2013 | Docket Event | Mail Returned Undeliverable (Notice of Entry of Judgment: Not deliverable as addressed) received from The Superior Court of Ventura on 11/07/2013 | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event |
Case assigned to Department 42.
Judge: Henry J. Walsh |
|
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Sister state judgment. | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Judgment on Sister State Judgment filed by Desert Schools Federal Credit Union a federally chartered credit union on 10/30/2013. | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment on Sister State Judgment filed by Desert Schools Federal Credit Union a federally chartered credit union on 10/30/2013. | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Certified Copy of Sister State Judgment filed by Desert Schools Federal Credit Union a federally chartered credit union on 10/30/2013. | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Sister-State Judgment - Application for Entry filed by Desert Schools Federal Credit Union a federally chartered credit union on 10/30/2013. Filed By: Desert Schools Federal Credit Union a federally chartered credit union(Plaintiff) Refers To: Collis, James(Defendant) | |
October 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment (Out of Process) generated. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.