Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Thousand Oaks Surgical Institute, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Diaz, Manuel J., against Hodges, Kiara Chansai, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kent M. Kellegrew presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKent M. Kellegrew Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2013 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions161 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1178 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
September 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
September 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) VENTURA generated. | |
September 06, 2013 | |||
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default heard 09/06/2013 08:15:00 AM. | |
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
September 06, 2013 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
May 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Thousand Oaks Surgical Institute on 05/29/2013. | |
April 04, 2013 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 09/06/2013 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.