Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Young, Recio, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Oconner, Mark D, against General Motors Llc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2013 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions118 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1619 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
September 06, 2013 | |||
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Young, Recio on 07/25/2013. | |
July 25, 2013 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 09/06/2013 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
April 08, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal (served Becky DeGeorge person authorized to accept service) filed by Young, Recio on 04/08/2013. | |
April 02, 2013 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 09/06/2013 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Young, Recio on 03/29/2013. Filed By: Young, Recio(Plaintiff) Refers To: General Motors LLC(Defendant) | |
March 29, 2013 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 41. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.