We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Gary Brown Vs. Lorenzo G Walker Md Apc

Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago ago

On March 29, 2013 a Medical Malpractice case was filed by Brown, Gary, represented by Rosenberg, Alexander , against Walker Md Apc, Lorenzo G, Walker, Lorenzo G, represented by Stockalper, Patrick E , Wetkowski, Melissa M , in the jurisdiction of Ventura County.

Case Details

Filing Date

March 29, 2013

Last Refreshed

December 20, 2021

Filing Location

Ventura County, CA

Judge

Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Medical Malpractice

Practice Area

Torts

Matter Type

Malpractice

Case Cycle Time

679 days

Time To Trial

159 days

Time to First Dissmisal Order

336 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case History

Type Description
Docket Event Declaration - Other (of trial attorney pursuant to section 9 of the California Rules of court judicial adminstration standards) filed by Walker MD APC, Lorenzo G; Walker, Lorenzo G on 05/17/2013.
(time estimate 10 days)
portions of the complaint
Docket Event Motion to Strike - portions of the complaint scheduled for 06/14/2013 at 08:20:00 AM in 43 was vacated.
Docket Event Ports Insurance Co. Inc added as a Lien Claimaint effective 07/16/2013.
See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.