Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Channel Islands Aviation Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Light, Jonathan Fraser, against Schauer, William P, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rocky J. Baio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRocky J. Baio Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 28, 2013 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions88 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1179 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014. | |
September 04, 2013 | |||
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 09/04/2013 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Channel Islands Aviation Inc on 06/24/2013. | |
May 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Channel Islands Aviation Inc on 05/13/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.