Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cornerstone Records Management Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Chow, Teresa C, against Agromin Corporation, represented by Wennergren, Kenneth H., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2013 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions136 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1619 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
September 04, 2013 | |||
August 12, 2013 | Docket Event | MANDATORY APPEARANCE CMC/Order to Show Cause Re Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Default - scheduled for 09/04/2013 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
August 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 12, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Cornerstone Records Management LLC on 08/12/2013. | |
June 13, 2013 | Docket Event | General Denial filed by Agromin Corporation on 06/13/2013. | |
June 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Order - Other (extending time for defendant to respond to complaint no later that June 12 2013) filed by Agromin Corporation on 06/10/2013. | |
June 05, 2013 | Docket Event | Application - Other (and order extending time to respond to complaint) filed by Agromin Corporation on 06/05/2013. | |
April 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (subeserved Darlene Camarillo, Administrator) filed by Cornerstone Records Management LLC on 04/09/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.