Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Fia Card Services Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Zide, Flint C, against Cunningham, Denise, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rocky J. Baio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRocky J. Baio Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions122 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time941 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of (Fully Satisfied) filed by FIA Card Services NA on 10/26/2015. | |
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Satisfied) filed by FIA Card Services NA on 08/20/2015. | |
August 20, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Flint C. Zide Re Waiver of Accruing Post Judgment Interest) filed by FIA Card Services NA on 02/05/2015. | |
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 02/05/2015. | |
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Non Military Status) filed by FIA Card Services NA on 02/05/2015. | |
February 05, 2015 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Costs 260.00, Credit 3330.66, Interest 0.0) filed by FIA Card Services NA on 02/05/2015. | |
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
January 15, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (fully satisfied) filed by FIA Card Services NA on 01/15/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.