Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Granet, Peter, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Romey, Daniel L., against Kushner, Linda, Kushner, Katherine Elizabeth, represented by Wessler, Charles P, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent J. O'Neill, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2013 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Time To Trial159 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions376 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time381 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2014 | |||
April 21, 2014 |
(time estimate 5 days)
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
||
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 05/09/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B was vacated.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
April 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Granet, Peter on 04/09/2014. | |
March 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Court's Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to Representation of Settlement - scheduled for 05/09/2014 at 08:15:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Subpoenaed record updated on BPD Sports Therapy ON 02/06/2014 | |
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Subpoenaed record updated on Medical Records Los Robles Hospital ON 02/13/2014 | |
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Unconditional Settlement filed by Granet, Peter on 03/12/2014. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.