We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Petition Of Feifei Shi

Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago ago

On March 29, 2013 a Petitions - Other case was filed by Shi, Feifei, represented by against represented by in the jurisdiction of Ventura County.

Case Details

Filing Date

March 29, 2013

Last Refreshed

December 20, 2021

Filing Location

Ventura County, CA

Judge

Henry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Petitions - Other

Practice Area

Civil

Matter Type

General Civil

Case Cycle Time

60 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Parties

Plaintiffs

Attorneys for Plaintiffs

Case History

Type Description

Judge: Henry J. Walsh

Docket Event Decree Changing Name filed by Shi, Feifei on 05/28/2013.
Docket Event Petition for Change of Name has been Granted.
Docket Event Case disposed with disposition of Granted.
Docket Event OSC - Change of Name - scheduled for 05/28/2013 at 08:20:00 AM in 42 at Ventura.

Judge: Henry J. Walsh

Docket Event Case assigned to Department 42.

Judge: Henry J. Walsh

Docket Event Petition for Change of Name filed by Shi, Feifei on 03/29/2013. Filed By: Shi, Feifei(Petitioner)
Docket Event Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Shi, Feifei on 03/29/2013.
Docket Event Order to Show Cause re Change of Name filed by Shi, Feifei on 03/29/2013.
Docket Event Proof of Publication (name change Tri Conty Sentry newspaper April 5, 12, 19, 26 2013) filed by Shi, Feifei on 04/26/2013.
See all events

For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.