Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chavez, Uriel, Anguiano, Karen, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTari L. Cody Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 29, 2013 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time750 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
November 20, 2014 | |||
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Decree Changing Name (Granted) filed by Anguiano, Karen; Chavez, Uriel on 11/20/2014. | |
November 20, 2014 | Docket Event | Petition for Change of Name has been Granted. | |
November 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - PERSONAL (Order to Show Cause on Maricela Lopez) filed by Chavez, Uriel on 11/18/2014. | |
October 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Proof of Publication (Tri County Setnry Sept 26, Oct 3, 10 , 17 2014) filed by Anguiano, Karen; Chavez, Uriel on 10/17/2014. | |
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause re Change of Name (Amended) filed by Chavez, Uriel on 09/16/2014. | |
September 16, 2014 | Docket Event | OSC - Change of Name - scheduled for 11/20/2014 at 08:20:00 AM in 20 at Ventura. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.