Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Burns, Rachel, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Schwartz, Richard A., against Matekel, Mariette, Matekel, Elizabeth, Matekel, David, Matekel, Caitlin Grace, represented by Katch, Michelle C., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent J. O'Neill, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2013 |
CategoryPi/Pd/Wd - Auto |
Time To Trial154 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions195 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
|
Case Cycle Time1458 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Burns, Rachel on 03/04/2014. | |
March 04, 2014 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
March 03, 2014 | (time estimate 7 days) | ||
March 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Jury Trial (LC) heard 03/03/2014 01:30:00 PM. | |
January 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Correspondence (Re Mediation Hearing) received from Goetz, Gisele on 01/13/2014 | |
December 17, 2013 | Docket Event | Goetz, Gisele appointed as Mediator . | |
October 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
October 10, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Burns, Rachel on 10/10/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.