Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Van Le, Du, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case against Schoonover, Steve, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTari L. Cody Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 28, 2013 |
CategoryEnforcement |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Case Cycle Time751 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
August 08, 2014 | |||
August 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (SHC) heard 08/08/2014 08:30:00 AM. | |
August 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service (application and order for apperance and examination; etc.) filed by Van Le, Du on 08/07/2014. | |
July 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service (application and order for appearance and examination, etc.) filed by Van Le, Du on 07/08/2014. | |
June 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Abstract issued on 06/25/2014. | |
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (SHC) - scheduled for 08/08/2014 at 08:30:00 AM in 20 at Ventura.
Judge: Tari L. Cody |
|
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Application and Order for Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor filed by Van Le, Du on 06/18/2014. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 03, 2014 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.