Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Eberts, Matthew, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with F. Dino Inumerable presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeF. Dino Inumerable Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2013 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions94 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time831 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
January 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (partially satisfied) filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria INC on 01/09/2015. | |
November 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of (FULL) filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria INC on 11/13/2014. | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Int 319.40) filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria INC on 04/17/2014. | |
April 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 04/17/2014. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014. | |
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Catherine Thornton in support of Atty fees costs and interest) filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria INC on 05/02/2013. | |
May 02, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does (1-10) filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria INC on 05/02/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.