Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gomez, Angelica filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 19, 2012 |
CategoryGuardianship Of Person Only |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2013 | Receipt of the Confidential Guardianship Status Report | ||
May 03, 2013 | Docket Event | Confidential Guardianship Status Report filed by Gomez, Benjamin; Guadalupe-Gomez, Maria on 05/03/2013. | |
June 26, 2012 | Docket Event | Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) (Order on Application to Waive Additional Court Fees and Costs was Granted in Part for Investigation Fees Only.) filed by Guadalupe-Gomez, Maria on 06/26/2012. | |
June 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Application/Request to Waive Additional Court Fees and Costs (Court Investigator Fees) filed by Guadalupe-Gomez, Maria on 06/25/2012. | |
June 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Guadalupe-Gomez, Maria Application for Waiver granted in part on 06/25/2012 . | |
June 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Order on Application to Waive Additional Court Fees and Costs sent to Judge Reiser for Review and Signature | |
June 12, 2012 | |||
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Hearing (PRG) - Receipt of the Confidential Guardianship Status Report scheduled for 06/12/2013 at 08:35:00 AM in J1 at Oxnard. | |
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition for Appointment of Co-Guardians of Minor(s) has been Granted. | |
June 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Miscellaneous Hearing (PRG) Receipt of the Confidential Guardianship Status Report is scheduled for 06/12/2013 at 08:35 AM in Department J1. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.