Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cemex Construction Materials Pacific Llc, filed a(n) Civil - Limited case represented by Walsh, Mark A, against American Contractors Indemnity Company A California Corporation, Conejo Recreation &Amp; Park District, Conejo Recreation & Park District, Maccor, Suretec Insurance Company, (total of 8) See All represented by Stroj, Robert J, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rebecca Susan Riley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRebecca Susan Riley Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 04, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions86 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1537 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
March 18, 2013 |
(Time estimate: 2 days)
Judge: Rebecca Susan Riley |
||
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event |
Court Trial (LC) - (Time estimate: 2 days) scheduled for 03/18/2013 at 01:30:00 PM in 40 was vacated.
Judge: Rebecca Susan Riley |
|
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party filed by Cemex Construction Materials Pacific LLC on 03/15/2013. | |
March 15, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Party filed by Cemex Construction Materials Pacific LLC on 03/15/2013. | |
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Statement of Nonagreement filed by Norman, Jean on 02/04/2013. | |
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Status of Mediation process changed to Settled before hearing on 12/11/2012. | |
February 04, 2013 | Docket Event | Appointment of ended. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.