Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Walsh, Mark D., against Garcia, Fausto Ii, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with F. Dino Inumerable presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeF. Dino Inumerable Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 21, 2012 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions168 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1123 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 01/20/2013. | |
September 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 09/05/2012. | |
September 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
September 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
August 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute (subserved to jessica garcia wife) filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 08/13/2012. | |
June 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration Regarding Non Service filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 06/06/2012. | |
April 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Affidavit - Other (of venue) filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 04/13/2012. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.