Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Settlement Capital Corporation, filed a(n) Petitions - Other case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kent M. Kellegrew presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKent M. Kellegrew Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 02, 2012 |
CategoryPetitions - Other |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1040 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015. | |
October 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Granted. | |
May 17, 2012 | for Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights | ||
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Approving Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights) filed by Settlement Capital Corporation on 05/17/2012. | |
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Petition - Other heard 05/17/2012 08:20:00 AM. | |
May 17, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition - Other has been Granted. | |
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - MAILING (Notice of hearing on Petition for Approval of Transfer of Structured settlement payment rights. Petition for Approval of transfer of structured settlement payment rights. proposed order and notice of case assignment) filed by Settlement Capital Corporation on 04/12/2012. | |
April 10, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition - Other - for Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights scheduled for 05/17/2012 at 08:20:00 AM in 43 at Ventura. | |
April 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing (on Petition for Approval of Transfer of Structured Settlement Payment Rights) filed by Settlement Capital Corporation on 04/02/2012. | |
April 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition - Other filed by Settlement Capital Corporation on 04/02/2012. Filed By: Settlement Capital Corporation(Petitioner) Refers To: DeJesus, Crystal(Interested Party) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.