Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sabol, Mike, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Moser, Tom, against Home Depot Usa Inc, represented by Knepper, Dawn M, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent J. O'Neill, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 06, 2012 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
Case Cycle Time118 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 14, 2012 |
Judge: Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. |
||
August 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference (Filing of Case Management Statement) - scheduled for 09/14/2012 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
August 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Statement filed by Sabol, Mike on 08/02/2012. | |
August 01, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Stay of Proceedings - Case filed by Home Depot USA Inc on 08/01/2012. | |
July 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Case Management Conference) filed by Sabol, Mike on 07/31/2012. | |
July 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference (Filing of Case Management Statement) - scheduled for 09/14/2012 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B at Ventura | |
May 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice - Other (of Removal to federal court) filed by Home Depot USA Inc on 05/30/2012. | |
May 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Home Depot USA Inc on 05/25/2012. | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt (Dawn M Knepper Attorney for) filed by Sabol, Mike on 05/04/2012. | |
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Sabol, Mike on 04/06/2012. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.