Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Kadillak, Leslie Dunn, Dunn, Margaret, Dunn, David, Dunn, Catherine, Dunn, Brian, (total of 5) See All filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Bunch, Bruce M., against Woodburn Md, James D Iii, Woodburn Md, James D Ii, Wang Md, Chung, represented by Schaeffer, James C., Bertling, Peter G., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rebecca Susan Riley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRebecca Susan Riley Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Time To Trial252 days |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions304 days |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
||
Case Cycle Time405 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 28, 2013 |
10 Day Time Estimate
Judge: Rebecca Susan Riley |
||
May 27, 2013 |
10 Day Time Estimate
Judge: Rebecca Susan Riley |
||
May 16, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal (and Proof of Service) filed by Wang MD, Chung; Woodburn MD, James D III on 05/16/2013. | |
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial (LC) - 10 Day Time Estimate scheduled for 05/28/2013 at 01:30:00 PM in 40 was vacated.
Judge: Rebecca Susan Riley |
|
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Summary judgment. | |
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
May 09, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Party (as to Defs james D. Woodburn II and III only) filed by Dunn, Margaret on 05/09/2013. | |
May 01, 2013 | |||
May 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Mandatory Settlement Conference heard 05/01/2013 10:30:00 AM. | |
April 30, 2013 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action submitted by Dunn, Margaret rejected on 04/30/2013. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.