Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tucker, Marsha E, filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 05, 2012 |
CategoryProbate |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2012 | Tentative Ruling |
Petitioner, in a 30-page petition, asks the Court to transfer incapacitated Roger Tucker's community property interests in 16 different personal property and real property assets to the petitioner, as...
Judge: Glen Reiser |
|
May 09, 2012 | Petition for Order Authorizing Particular Transactions Involving Community Property, etc | ||
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Petition for Probate heard 05/09/2012 09:00:00 AM. | |
May 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Order - Other (Authorizing Particular Transactions Involving Community Property) filed by Tucker, Marsha E on 05/09/2012. | |
May 08, 2012 | Docket Event | Tentative Ruling published. | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration in Support (Petition, Minor George Roy Flores) filed by Tucker, Marsha E on 05/04/2012. | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Proof of Service (re Declaration) filed by Tucker, Marsha E on 05/04/2012. | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Relative Justin Mychal Tucker, Waiver of Future Notice, etc) filed by Tucker, Marsha E on 05/04/2012. | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing filed by Tucker, Marsha E on 05/04/2012. | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Citation - Probate filed by Tucker, Marsha E on 05/04/2012. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.