Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Moore, Harvey M, against Sanders, Mark T, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent J. O'Neill, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2012 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions59 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1147 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 05/11/2012. | |
May 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
April 12, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Non Service) filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 04/12/2012. | |
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 03/13/2012. | |
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 03/13/2012. Filed By: Capital One Bank USA NA(Plaintiff) Refers To: Sanders, Mark(Defendant) | |
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Capital One Bank USA NA on 03/13/2012. | |
March 13, 2012 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 41. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.