Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hayavi M.D., Kevin, filed a(n) Civil - Limited case represented by Diaz, Manuel J., against Valencia, Griselda, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTari L. Cody Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 14, 2011 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions155 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1496 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
October 10, 2014 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013. | |
June 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 06/24/2012. | |
May 04, 2012 | re: SANCTIONS for Failure to Inform the Court regarding Bankruptcy status | ||
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Court ordered entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Hayavi M.D., Kevin on 05/04/2012. | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Dismissed. | |
May 04, 2012 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Dismissed. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.