Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Sheffield Properties Of Illinois Inc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Seide, Richard L, against Sheffield Properties Of Illinois Inc, Geocomm Unlimited Corporation, represented by Diaz, Manuel J., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTari L. Cody Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2011 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions23 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time1503 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013. | |
December 01, 2012 | |||
June 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 06/24/2012. | |
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 45 effective 03/29/2012. | |
March 21, 2012 | Docket Event | Case Management Order filed by The Superior Court of Ventura on 03/21/2012. | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Stipulated judgment. | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by SHEFFIELD PROPERTIES OF ILLINOIS INC; Geocomm Unlimited Corporation on 12/22/2011. | |
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.