Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Hsbc Bank Nevada N A, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Winn, Brian N, against Mora, Mario P, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 28, 2010 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions52 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time626 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Without Satisfaction) filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A on 06/15/2012. | |
June 15, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Interest 143.36) filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A on 07/13/2011. | |
July 13, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ issued 07/13/2011. | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A on 11/19/2010. | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A on 11/19/2010. | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A on 11/19/2010. | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Re Underlying Action of Account Stated) filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A on 11/19/2010. | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Re Waiver of Atty Fees) filed by HSBC Bank Nevada N A on 11/19/2010. | |
November 19, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment for HSBC Bank Nevada N A against Mora, Mario P in the amount of: 2073.62 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 275.00 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 11/19/2010. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.