Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Schechter, Joby, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rocky J. Baio presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRocky J. Baio Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateJuly 23, 2010 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions84 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1867 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 02, 2015 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of (Full) filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria Inc on 09/02/2015. | |
August 21, 2015 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of submitted by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria Inc rejected on 08/21/2015. | |
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (credit 1250.00 interest 1251.82) filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria Inc on 05/01/2014. | |
May 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Abstract issued on 05/01/2014. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013. | |
June 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 06/24/2012. | |
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 45 effective 03/29/2012. | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria Inc on 01/27/2011. | |
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment for Credit Bureau of Santa Maria Inc against Schechter, Joby in the amount of: 2404.43 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 216.00 costs, 283.92 pre-judgment interest, and 530.89 attorney fees entered on 01/27/2011. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.