Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chase Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Snyder, David B., against Sharp, Noah D, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Rebecca Susan Riley presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRebecca Susan Riley Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions89 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1894 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Chase Bank USA NA on 03/30/2010. | |
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
March 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Case assigned to Department 40. | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Declaration for Court Assignment filed by Chase Bank USA NA on 12/31/2009. | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Complaint filed by Chase Bank USA NA on 12/31/2009. Filed By: Chase Bank USA NA(Plaintiff) Refers To: Sharp, Noah(Defendant) | |
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet filed by Chase Bank USA NA on 12/31/2009. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.