Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chase Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Nguyen, Huan T, against Graham, Steven W, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Vincent J. O'Neill, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeVincent J. O'Neill, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions120 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1903 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (unsatisfied) filed by Chase Bank USA NA on 03/17/2015. | |
March 17, 2015 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (interest: $154.56) filed by Chase Bank USA NA on 06/21/2010. | |
June 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ issued. | |
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment - Stipulated filed by Chase Bank USA NA on 04/29/2010. | |
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Stipulated judgment. | |
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment for Chase Bank USA NA against Graham, Steven W in the amount of: 11667.19 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 366.00 costs, 242.93 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 04/29/2010. | |
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal of Does (1 through 10) filed by Chase Bank USA NA on 04/23/2010. | |
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Stipulation - Other (for Entry of Judgment with Stay of Entry to Provide for Installment Payments & Declaration of Steven W Graham) filed by Chase Bank USA NA on 04/23/2010. | |
April 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Application - Other (of Plaintiff for Judgment Pursuant to CCP 664.6 and Declaration Re Default on Payments on Stipulation for Judgment Acknowledgement of Credits and Re Accrued Interest) filed by Chase Bank USA NA on 04/23/2010. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.