Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Lee, Raymond J, against Cagley, Charles, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryBreach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions411 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Cycle Time756 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
January 25, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Returned unsatisfied) filed by American Express Centurion Bank on 01/25/2012. | |
November 23, 2011 | Docket Event | Exhibits destroyed. | |
September 22, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Destroy Exhibits generated. | |
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Cost & Credit $0; Interest $406.57) filed by American Express Centurion Bank on 05/20/2011. | |
May 20, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ issued 05/20/2011. | |
March 28, 2011 | Docket Event | Abstract issued. | |
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment for American Express Centurion Bank against Cagley, Charles in the amount of: 27822.89 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 420.00 costs, 3331.12 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 02/14/2011. | |
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court finding. | |
February 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Judgment by Court - After Trial filed by American Express Centurion Bank on 02/14/2011. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.