Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
American Express Centurion Bank, filed a(n) Civil - Unlimited case represented by Lee, Raymond J, against Khairi, Dawn, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTari L. Cody Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions169 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Case Cycle Time1935 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013. | |
June 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 06/24/2012. | |
February 19, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 45 effective 02/17/2012. | |
August 26, 2010 | |||
August 26, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Management Order filed by The Superior Court of Ventura on 08/26/2010. | |
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Order - Other (permitting use of copies) filed by American Express Centurion Bank on 08/13/2010. | |
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment for American Express Centurion Bank against Khairi, Dawn in the amount of: 138679.01 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 420.00 costs, 6302.73 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 08/13/2010. | |
August 13, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Court filed by American Express Centurion Bank on 08/13/2010. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.