Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank Issuer Of The Discover Card, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Humbree, Daniel Lee, against Annino, Lauren M, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions204 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1894 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 09, 2015 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
August 02, 2010 | |||
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Dismissal. | |
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event | OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication - scheduled for 08/02/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B was vacated. | |
July 23, 2010 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Dismissal. | |
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Discover Bank Issuer of the Discover Card on 07/21/2010. | |
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address and/or Telephone (and Firm Name) filed by Discover Bank Issuer of the Discover Card on 07/21/2010. | |
June 29, 2010 | Docket Event | OSC for Sanctions/Dismissal for Failure to File Proof of Service/Publication - scheduled for 08/02/2010 at 08:30:00 AM in 22B at Ventura. | |
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Unserved filed by Discover Bank Issuer of the Discover Card on 03/09/2010. | |
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Unserved (dec of non service atempts March 5, March 6, 2010) filed by Discover Bank Issuer of the Discover Card on 03/09/2010. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.