Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Chase Bank Usa, N.A., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Davis, Shedrick O, against Aravena, Guillermo R, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Kevin G. DeNoce presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKevin G. DeNoce Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryOther Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions41 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time2908 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013. | |
June 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 06/24/2012. | |
March 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 45 effective 02/24/2012. | |
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal without Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A. on 02/10/2010. | |
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
February 10, 2010 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal. | |
January 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A. on 01/25/2010. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.