Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Discover Bank Issuer Of The Discover Card, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Bollero, Barbara L, against Ramirez, Ronald, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions68 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time1728 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Substitution of Attorney (old Hallie N. Zimmerman new Peter R. Osterman) filed by Discover Bank Issuer of the Discover Card on 09/24/2014. | |
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event | Osterman, Peter R added as a effective 09/24/2014. | |
July 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Partially Satisfied) filed by Discover Bank Issuer of the Discover Card on 07/31/2012. | |
July 31, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
November 14, 2011 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address and/or Telephone (Firm Name, and Change of Lead Atty) filed by Discover Bank Issuer of the Discover Card on 11/14/2011. | |
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ issued. | |
March 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Abstract issued on $ISSUANCEDATE. | |
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration Pursuant to CCP 1033(b) filed by Discover Bank Issuer of the Discover Card on 03/09/2010. | |
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. | |
March 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Judgment for Discover Bank Issuer of the Discover Card against Ramirez, Ronald in the amount of: 4198.70 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 284.50 costs, 0.00 pre-judgment interest, and 800.00 attorney fees entered on 03/09/2010. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.