Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Gardner Management Company, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Weisman, Jessica Sue, against Williams, Kenneth, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFrederick H. Bysshe, Jr. Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer - Residential |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions21 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Cycle Time3265 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 27 effective 12/09/2018. | |
February 11, 2017 | Docket Event |
Case reassigned to Department 22 effective 02/11/2017.
Judge: Frederick H. Bysshe, Jr. |
|
February 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 23 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 48 effective 02/02/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 44 effective 01/20/2013. | |
May 14, 2012 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of (Full) filed by Gardner Management Company on 05/14/2012. | |
May 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
May 02, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Returned satisfied) filed by Gardner Management Company on 05/02/2012. | |
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Writ issued on 02/29/2012. | |
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (Adrienne R. Kelly pursuant to CCP 695.220 regarding the order of crediting of money received) filed by Gardner Management Company on 02/29/2012. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.