Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Mcinturff, Linda Ann, filed a(n) Harassment - Torts case against Calvin, Allen Richard, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Matthew P. Guasco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMatthew P. Guasco Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateSeptember 23, 2009 |
CategoryHarassment |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions20 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeHarassment |
|
Case Cycle Time1408 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed pursuant to GC 68152(d) 1 or 2 | |
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event | McInturff, Linda Ann Application for Waiver granted in full. | |
October 15, 2009 | Docket Event | Order on Application for Waiver of Additional Court Fees filed by McInturff, Linda Ann on 10/15/2009. | |
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Court-ordered dismissal. | |
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Temporary Restraining Order dissolved. | |
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event | The court orders the entire action dismissed without prejudice. | |
October 13, 2009 | Docket Event | Consent for Court Assignment filed. | |
October 09, 2009 | |||
October 08, 2009 | Docket Event | Order on Application for Waiver of Court Fees and Costs (Granted in Whole) filed by McInturff, Linda Ann on 10/08/2009. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.