Case Last Refreshed: 5 years ago
Chase Bank Usa, N.A., A Corporation, filed a(n) Civil - Limited case represented by Nguyen, Huan T, against Linderman, Jeff S., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts Ventura.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 04, 2009 |
CategoryCivil - Limited |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2018 |
|
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
|
Filing Court HouseVentura |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Action | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 06, 2015 | Action | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 02/06/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Action | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Action | Case reassigned to 20 effective 01/20/2013. | |
February 10, 2012 | Action | Case reassigned to 44 effective 02/10/2012. | |
January 11, 2011 | Action | Application - Other (for judgment pursuant to CCP 664.6) filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A., A Corporation on 01/11/2011. | |
January 11, 2011 | Action | Stipulation for Entry of Judgment filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A., A Corporation on 01/11/2011. | |
January 11, 2011 | Action | Case disposed with disposition of Stipulated judgment. | |
January 11, 2011 | Action | Judgment for Chase Bank USA, N.A., A Corporation against Linderman, Jeff S. in the amount of: 7959.24 principal, 0.00 punitive damages, 373.00 costs, 518.11 pre-judgment interest, and 0.00 attorney fees entered on 01/11/2011. | |
January 11, 2011 | Action | Judgment - Stipulated filed by Chase Bank USA, N.A., A Corporation on 01/11/2011. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.