Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Grimes, Patrick, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMay 28, 2009 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions104 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time659 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (Without Satisfaction) filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria Inc on 03/18/2011. | |
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
November 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria Inc on 11/17/2010. | |
November 17, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ issued 11/17/2010. | |
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria Inc on 09/07/2010. | |
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event | Writ issued. | |
April 15, 2010 | |||
April 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Appearance and Examination of Judgment Debtor (SHC) - scheduled for 04/15/2010 at 08:20:00 AM in 40 was vacated. | |
April 09, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration and Order - Other (tr remove debtors exam from court calendar) filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria Inc on 04/09/2010. | |
April 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Declaration and Order - Other (tr remove debtors exam from court calendar forwarded to Judge Reiser) received from Credit Bureau of Santa Maria Inc on 04/01/2010 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.