Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Juice And Java On Chestnut Llc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Henry J. Walsh presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHenry J. Walsh Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateOctober 24, 2008 |
CategoryRule 3.740 Collections |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions55 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Cycle Time3894 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152 | |
August 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution Returned (partially satisfied) filed by CREDIT BUREAU OF SANTA MARIA INC on 08/24/2009. | |
August 24, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ has been updated. | |
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of (Full Satisfaction) filed by CREDIT BUREAU OF SANTA MARIA INC on 06/04/2009. | |
January 21, 2009 | Docket Event | Writ issued. | |
January 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Default entered as to Juice and Java on Chestnut LLC on Complaint - Assignee within Small Claims Jurisdictional Limit. | |
January 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Default judgment by clerk. | |
December 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment by Default by Clerk filed by CREDIT BUREAU OF SANTA MARIA INC on 12/18/2008. | |
December 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Entry of Default (clerks jmt) filed by CREDIT BUREAU OF SANTA MARIA INC on 12/18/2008. | |
December 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration - Other (of Rhonda Cruz Bigby in support of atty fees court costs and interest) filed by CREDIT BUREAU OF SANTA MARIA INC on 12/18/2008. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.