We are checking for the latest updates in this case. We will email you when the process is complete.

Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria V. Hernandez Et Al.,

Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago

Credit Bureau Of Santa Maria, Inc., filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case represented by Weare, Heather M, against Hernandez, Erlinda, Hernandez, Simon, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Jeffrey G. Bennett presiding.

Case Details

Filing Date

June 30, 2008

Last Refreshed

August 11, 2022

Filing Location

Ventura County, CA

Judge

Jeffrey G. Bennett Track Judge’s New Cases

Category

Rule 3.740 Collections

Practice Area

Creditor

Matter Type

Collections

Case Cycle Time

4010 days

Time to First Dismissal Order

101 days

Verdict

Unclassified

Case Events

Type Description
Docket Event Case File Destroyed Pursuant to GC 68152
Docket Event Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/06/2015.
Docket Event Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of (Full satisfaction) filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria, Inc. on 09/09/2013.
Docket Event Abstract has been updated.
Docket Event Writ of Execution Returned (unsatisfied) filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria, Inc. on 01/09/2013.
Docket Event Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest (Cost 55.00 Credit 300.00 Interest 486.24) filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria, Inc. on 09/17/2012.
Docket Event Writ issued on 09/17/2012.
Docket Event Writ of Execution Returned (Without Satisfaction) filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria, Inc. on 05/23/2011.
Docket Event Writ has been updated.
Docket Event Memorandum of Costs After Judgment; Acknowledgment of Credit and Declaration of Accrued Interest filed by Credit Bureau of Santa Maria, Inc. on 11/01/2010.
See all events