Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Boyle, Lindsey, filed a(n) Wrongful Termination - Labor and Employment case represented by Petoyan, Marcus, against Big Sky Country Club Llc, Allen, Donel, Lost Canyons Llc, Landmark National, represented by Stankowski, James A., in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 31, 2007 |
CategoryWrongful Termination |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions441 days |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeWrongful Termination |
|
Case Cycle Time2362 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 21 effective 02/16/2014. | |
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event | Case File Destroyed pursuant to GC 68152(d) 1 or 2 | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 01/20/2013. | |
March 30, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 44 effective 03/29/2012. | |
December 18, 2008 | Docket Event | Request for Dismissal with Prejudice - Entire Action filed by Boyle, Lindsey on 12/18/2008. | |
December 01, 2008 | |||
November 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Case disposed with disposition of Dismissed. | |
November 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Case dismissed with disposition of Dismissed. | |
November 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Minutes finalized for Mandatory Settlement Conference heard 11/14/2008 09:00:00 AM. | |
November 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Jury Trial (LC) - scheduled for 12/01/2008 at 10:00:00 AM in S5 was vacated. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.