Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Owens, Nicholas, Judd, Nicole, Gregory, Joseph, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Gray, Nancy E., against Chivaroli &Amp; Associates Inc, Chivaroli & Associates Inc, in the jurisdiction of Ventura County. This case was filed in Ventura County Superior Courts with Tari L. Cody presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTari L. Cody Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 27, 2007 |
CategoryOther Employment |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2022 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationVentura County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Case Cycle Time2852 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2015 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 43 effective 4/18/2015. | |
February 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to Department 20 effective 02/16/2014. | |
January 20, 2013 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 21 effective 01/20/2013. | |
June 24, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 20 effective 06/24/2012. | |
February 09, 2012 | Docket Event | Case reassigned to 45 effective 02/08/2012. | |
December 06, 2007 | |||
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order (for protective order) filed by Chivaroli & Associates Inc on 11/05/2007. | |
November 05, 2007 | Docket Event | consolidated with lead case CIV246121 on 11/05/2007. | |
October 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference (Filing of Case Management Statement) - scheduled for 12/06/2007 at 01:30:00 PM in S1CM at Simi Valley | |
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event | Answer filed by Chivaroli & Associates Inc on 08/15/2007. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.