Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Garcia, Miguel filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 1986 |
CategoryAdl Criminal Adult |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 08, 1986 | Docket Event |
Trial Calendar J-12 9:00 POSS C S 2 D |
|
September 05, 1986 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal 7: MT & ORDER OF DISMISSAL (GAVIN); MFILM:294-630; |
|
September 05, 1986 | Docket Event | Def Res Dismissal by Prosecutor | |
September 05, 1986 | Docket Event |
Disposition Hearing (GAVIN)ORDER OF DISMISSAL SIGNED.; 86AD 3:1(BAUGHER); |
|
September 05, 1986 | Docket Event | Case Resolution: Dismissal by Prosecutor | |
July 24, 1986 | Docket Event |
Notice of Substitution of Counsel 6: NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; THOMAS BOTHWELL FOR CHRIS TAIT; |
|
July 23, 1986 | Docket Event |
Trial Clerks Setting 5: TRIAL CLERK'S SETTING; 09-08-1986TD; J-12 9:00 POSS C S 2 D; |
|
July 21, 1986 | Docket Event |
Initial Arraignment (GAVIN) ARRAIGN, INFO READ, TDR 09-; 08-86. 86AD 2:39 (BAUGHER); |
|
July 21, 1986 | Docket Event |
Order on Arraignment 4: ORDER ON ARRAIGNMENT; |
|
July 18, 1986 | Docket Event |
Information 3: INFORMATION; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.