Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Collins, Danielle N, Collins, William T, filed a(n) Judgment Enforcement - Creditor case represented by Abeyta, David, against Dollar Tree Stores, Inc, represented by Tobias, Rachel Read, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 27, 2021 |
CategoryFju Foreign Judgment |
Last RefreshedDecember 02, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeJudgment Enforcement |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Withdraw | |
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
September 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Absence Unavailability | |
September 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Note for Trial and Statement of Arbitrability | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice Withdraw and Substitution of Counsel | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer and Affirmative Defense | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Foreign Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.