Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Northwest Farm Credit Services, Pca, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Yeung, Binah B, against Barragan Alvarez, Silvia, Castillo, Jesus, Logistic & Transport, Llc, Viga Ranch Llc, Villalobos, Oliver, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Susan C. Arb presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan C. Arb Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2021 |
CategoryFor Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice
Judge: Arb, Susan |
|
August 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Motion to Dismiss | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Publication -YAKIMA HERALD-REPUBLIC |
|
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Publication -EL SOL DE YAKIMA |
|
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Motion to Serve by Publication | |
December 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service OF ATTEMPTED |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order of Default AGAINST DEFENDANT JESUS CASTILLO Judge: Arb, Susan |
|
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Declaration Affidavit |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.