Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Department Of Labor And Industries Of The State Of Washington, filed a(n) Msc2 Miscellaneous - Civil case represented by Cartwright, Diana Sheythe, against Garcia, Carmen, Garcia, Rene, G & G Orchards Inc, Rc Orchards Llc, represented by Elliott, James Stephen, in the jurisdiction of Yakima County, WA, . Yakima County, WA Superior Courts with Susan C. Arb presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSusan C. Arb Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryMsc2 Miscellaneous - Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationYakima County, WA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial-12 15 days |
|
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Case Resolution Dismissal Without Trial | |
August 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order of Dismissal Stipulated
Judge: Boswell, Jared A |
|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Case Schedule
Judge: Arb, Susan |
|
November 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice for Trial Setting (JY12; 3/18/2024; 15D; 9:30am) |
|
November 10, 2022 | Docket Event | Order Setting Case Schedule | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
October 28, 2022 | Docket Event | Affidavit Declaration Certificate Confirmation of Service | |
August 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Notice of Appearance | |
August 18, 2021 | Docket Event | Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.